This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/10/2022 at 13:40:20 (UTC).

ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP,Silva-Lopez, Jesus vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 ADVANCED WELLNESS REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP,Silva-Lopez, Jesus filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6987

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP, a

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Silva-Lopez, Jesus

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

LETTER FROM CLERK

07/19/2022: LETTER FROM CLERK

NOTICE

07/28/2022: NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED WELLNESS & REHABILITATION CENTER, CORP, a is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman