This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/08/2021 at 18:04:10 (UTC).

Advanced Restoration Inc vs People's Trust Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Advanced Restoration Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against People's Trust Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7584

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Advanced Restoration Inc

350 N Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Williams, Billie

Williams, Horace

Defendant

People's Trust Insurance Company

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVICH , DAVID WILLIAM

Attorney at COHEN LAW GROUP

350 North Lake Destiny Rd

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

HALLIGAN , LINDSEY

Attorney at COLE, SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

110 Se 6Th St

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/23/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/23/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/24/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST

02/23/2021: REQUEST

REQUEST

02/23/2021: REQUEST

INTERROGATORIES

02/23/2021: INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

02/23/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS 03/30/2021 DEFT. PEOPLE'S TRUST INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: People's Trust Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Advanced Restoration Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED RESTORATION GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Peoples Trust Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Halligan, Lindsey