Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/13/2021 at 11:27:14 (UTC).

ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS,Curry, Camille vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS,Curry, Camille filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, M. Monique and Scott, Monique. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6533

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, M. Monique

Scott, Monique. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

Sunrise, FL 33323

Curry, Camille

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

SANDEFER , KIMBERLY A

Attorney at DUTTON LAW GROUP

4921 Memorial Hwy Ste 110

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/06/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: THAT POLICY LIMITS HAVE BEEN REACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ADVANCED REGENERATIVE ORTHOPEDICS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBERLY A SANDEFER