This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 10:11:26 (UTC).

Adco Billing Solutions, Lp,Feliciano, Natalia Olivio vs Geico Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 Adco Billing Solutions, Lp,Feliciano, Natalia Olivio filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico Indemnity Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, Joseph. M and Tompkins, M. Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7004

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adco Billing Solutions, Lp A/A/O Natalia Olivio Feliciano

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Feliciano, Natalia Olivio

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH , DANIEL B

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

LOTT , MEGHAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/29/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/29/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/29/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adco Billing Solutions, Lp

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADCO BILLING SOLUTIONS LP is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , DANIEL B