This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 03/26/2022 at 16:09:40 (UTC).

Adas Plus, Llc vs Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Adas Plus, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Infinity Auto Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2820

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adas Plus, Llc A/A/O Mirlenys Espinoza

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Adas Plus, Llc

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

ESPINOZA, MIRLENYS

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MCDANIEL , BRANDEN VINCENT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/17/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/17/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/19/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/23/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/17/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

03/11/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLNTFS DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: THE COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adas Plus, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adas Plus, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adas Plus, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adas Plus, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Adas Plus, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Adas Plus, Llc A/A/O Yraiza Josefina is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P