This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/11/2021 at 10:46:17 (UTC).

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION vs PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO

Case Summary

On 02/08/2020 ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8245

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

3321 Henderson Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant

PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO

Tampa, FL 33634

Garnishee

FANATICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANGELOV , GEORGI

Attorney at GIBBONS NEUMAN

3321 Henderson Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

VESCHIO , VICTOR H

Attorney at GIBBONS, NEUMAN, BELLO, SEGALL, ET AL

3321 Henderson Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/01/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

ORDER

05/14/2020: ORDER

FINAL JUDGMENT

06/04/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

08/11/2020: WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/08/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/08/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/08/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/20/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL ORDER; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT AND ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO DISBURSE FUNDS; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO; Garnishee: FANATICS INC; Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION; Private Attorney: VESCHIO , VICTOR H; Date 2: 10/16/2020; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: (10/12/2020 @ 9:45AM); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING GARNISHEE TO DISBURSE FUNDS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 9/19/2020 - DEFT: FANATICS, INC. C/O GENERAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Garnishee: FANATICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO FS 77-041(2); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: ISSUED BY THE CLERK PER ORDER DTD 8/8/20 MCB FORECLOSURE@GIBBLAW.COM; GIBBFORE@GMAIL.COM; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO; Garnishee: FANATICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORLANDO PEREZ PEREZ 02/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ PEREZ, ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FANATICS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGELOV , GEORGI