Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 14:41:49 (UTC).

ACEBO, MARLENE vs CITY OF TAMPA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 ACEBO, MARLENE filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CITY OF TAMPA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoddard, C.. Ralph, Foster, A. Robert and Stoddard, Ralph C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2476

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

Foster, A. Robert

Stoddard, Ralph C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACEBO, JOSE

Tampa, FL 33606

HUERTA, NANCY LEE

Tampa, FL 33606

OLDHAM, NELIDA L

Tampa, FL 33606

JAMES, MARILYN

Tampa, FL 33606

ACEBO, TERESA

Tampa, FL 33606

ROIG, OLGA

Tampa, FL 33606

FONTE, IGNAZIO G

Tampa, FL 33606

LEE, DAVID

Tampa, FL 33606

BETANCOURT, ELSIE

Tampa, FL 33606

ACEBO, MARLENE

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendants

ST JOSEPHS HOSPITAL INC

3001 W. Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33607

CITY OF TAMPA

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRANDA , FRANK CHARLES

Attorney at FRANK CHARLES MIRANDA, P.A.

3226 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorneys

COSTELLO , SHANE T

Attorney at HILL, WARD & HENDERSON, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

CURRY , LANDIS VERNON, III

Attorney at PAUL KNOPF BIGGER

511 W Bay St Ste 450

Tampa, FL 33606

MCLAREN , SCOTT ALAN

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602

BOLVES , BRIAN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MANSON BOLVES DONALDSON VARN, P.A

109 N Brush St Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO TAX COSTS

02/05/2018: MOTION TO TAX COSTS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/16/2016: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

EXHIBIT

10/06/2016: EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/12/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/30/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

03/15/2016: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/15/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/29/2016: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/16/2016: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/16/2016: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/16/2016: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/16/2016: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/16/2016: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/02/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/15/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/15/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/29/2016: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MIRANDA, FRANK C, Esquire; Date 2: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: BOLVES, BRIAN ALEXANDER; Date 2: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: COSTELLO, SHANE T; Date 2: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: CURRY, LANDIS VERNON, III; Date 2: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: MCLAREN, SCOTT ALAN; Date 2: 05/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; Comment: MANSON BOLVES DONALDSON VARN PA -; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO TAX COSTS; Additional Info: Defendant: CITY OF TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • MOTION TO TAX COSTS; Additional Info: Defendant: ST JOSEPHS HOSPITAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Comment: OF COUNT IV OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 frank@fcmlaw.com ; lourdes@fcmlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X 2 frank@fcmlaw.com ; lourdes@fcmlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Dismissal Docket; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 508 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016368304; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016344635; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016344614; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016344619; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Judgment Code: FSJ; Judgment Description: FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2018028340; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2018041409; Judge: Foster, Robert A, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Joseph S Hospital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSTELLO , SHANE TIMOTHY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLAREN , SCOTT ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN ALEXANDER BOLVES