This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/13/2022 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC vs Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, Susan. S, Lopez, S. Susan, Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, S. Marc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5281

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, Susan. S

Lopez, S. Susan

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, S. Marc

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

GUTIERREZ, LEIDY

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP PA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/22/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/25/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/22/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC; Plaintiff: GUTIERREZ, LEIDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: ACCUGLASS AUTOGLASS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accuglass Autoglass Llc A/A/O Marcus Crenshaw is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM