This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/30/2023 at 22:13:16 (UTC).

AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP,Harrison, Joe vs PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP,Harrison, Joe filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, S. Marc and Makholm, Marc. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4692

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, S. Marc

Makholm, Marc. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP

1711 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Harrison, Joe

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Chief Financial Officer 200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , KEITH PATRICK

Attorney at LIGORI & LIGORI, PA

1711 W Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

VALEN , EDWIN V

Attorney at HAMILTON, MILLER & BIRTHISEL, LLP

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1210

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/03/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/03/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/03/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/03/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/03/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/03/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/03/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/04/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/20/2022: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/02/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/05/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023007836; Judge: Makholm, Marc S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: (FINAL) / AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AGAINST PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: AAA PHYSICIANS GROUP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Permanent General Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWIN V VALEN