This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2023 at 17:21:47 (UTC).

2017-2 IH Borrower LP vs Lewis, Destiny

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 2017-2 IH Borrower LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lewis, Destiny. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Giardina, S. James and Giardina, James. S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5914

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Giardina, S. James

Giardina, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2017-2 IH Borrower LP

Defendants

Lewis, Destiny

Lewis, Gregory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/22/2023: COMPLAINT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/26/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/26/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023055717; Judge: Giardina, James S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Lewis, Destiny; Defendant: Lewis, Gregory;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less