This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/27/2023 at 17:10:04 (UTC).

2017-2 IH Borrower LP vs Howard, Paula

Case Summary

On 01/22/2023 2017-2 IH Borrower LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Howard, Paula. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Makholm, Marc. S and Makholm, S. Marc. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5917

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Makholm, Marc. S

Makholm, S. Marc

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2017-2 IH Borrower LP

Defendant

Howard, Paula

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/22/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/27/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/10/2023: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

02/10/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/10/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/10/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

02/10/2023: VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

02/15/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/22/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: JFP; Judgment Description: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION; Instrument Number: 2023075061; Judge: Makholm, Marc S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Howard, Paula;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON MILITARY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY; Additional Info: Defendant: Howard, Paula;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 1/27/23 PAULA HOWARD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Howard, Paula;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: 2017-2 IH Borrower LP;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less