This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 09/22/2020 at 16:21:48 (UTC).

ZAX BROOKSVILLE LLC VS FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 ZAX BROOKSVILLE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAX BROOKSVILLE LLC

Defendant

FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBLOW, BRIAN KEITH

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM FILED BY FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC

10/07/2020:ANSWER & CROSSCLAIM FILED BY FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC (SUBST SERVED TO DAWN STAYTON) 092120 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

09/28/2020:NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FOCUS DEVELOPMENT LLC (SUBST SERVED TO DAWN STAYTON) 092120 (ATTACHED) FILED BY PLNTF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON REGISTERED AGENT

09/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON REGISTERED AGENT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON {BLANK}

09/03/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON {BLANK}

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BOBLOW@COTNEYCL.COM

09/03/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BOBLOW@COTNEYCL.COM

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

09/03/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

COVER SHEET

09/03/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOCUS DEVELOPMENT, LLC C/O BRIAN F. STAYTON {BLANK}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS BOBLOW@COTNEYCL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 697341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000728CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Focus Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN OBLOW