This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/02/2019 at 16:16:11 (UTC).

WOODWORTH, NANCY VS GAYLE, DELROY S Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 WOODWORTH, NANCY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GAYLE, DELROY S. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODWORTH, NANCY

Defendants

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

GAYLE, DELROY S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNSIDE, WALTER NORWOOD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF DELROY GAYLE ON AUGUST 13, 2020 @10:00AM VIA ZOOM

07/07/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF DELROY GAYLE ON AUGUST 13, 2020 @10:00AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, NANCY WOODWORTH - FILED BY DEFENDANT

08/18/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, NANCY WOODWORTH - FILED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

07/28/2020:NOTICE-COMPL REQ FOR COPIES (PARTIAL - SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/20/2020:REPLY TO ANSWER/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/20/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF

02/04/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2020:NOTICE OF - DISCLOSURE FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (CONSORTIUM) TO PLNTF, ROBERT WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (CONSORTIUM) TO PLNTF, ROBERT WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS TPAcrtpleadings@wickersmith.com FILED BY DEF, DELORY GAYLE

02/18/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS TPAcrtpleadings@wickersmith.com FILED BY DEF, DELORY GAYLE

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DELROY GAYLE

02/18/2020:ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DELROY GAYLE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/04/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLNTF, NANCY WOODWORTH FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL E REED ESQ AND MEGHAN L THEODORE ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, DELROY GAYLE

02/18/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MICHAEL E REED ESQ AND MEGHAN L THEODORE ESQ ON BEHALF OF DEF, DELROY GAYLE

NTC OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY W/ PREJ

06/10/2020:NTC OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY W/ PREJ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY CHIEF FINANCIAL ~ BLANK

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY CHIEF FINANCIAL ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DELROY GAYLE ~ BLANK

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DELROY GAYLE ~ BLANK

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

11/08/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET

11/08/2019:COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY - CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DELROY GAYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number H 656940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT/PETITION (FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DELROY GAYLE (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DELROY GAYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 655021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY CHIEF FINANCIAL ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DELROY GAYLE ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001259CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNSIDE , WALTER NORWOOD, III