This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:08:08 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS TROISI, DONALD A

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TROISI, DONALD A. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendant

TROISI, DONALD A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUFFY, AMANDA ROATH

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

05/21/2020:COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

05/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DONALD A TROISI ~ BLANK

05/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DONALD A TROISI ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DONALD A TROISI

05/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DONALD A TROISI

MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

05/27/2020:MTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER EST MTN PRACTICE PROCEDURES FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 022820 DTD 022820

ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

05/27/2020:ORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

05/27/2020:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

05/27/2020:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI

07/22/2020:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - ALIAS SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI (BLANK)

09/04/2020:ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - ALIAS SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI (BLANK)

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DONALD A TROISI

09/04/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DONALD A TROISI

NOTICE AND INTENT TO DISMISS DTD 102621

10/26/2021:NOTICE AND INTENT TO DISMISS DTD 102621

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND INTENT TO DISMISS DTD 102621

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DONALD A TROISI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - ALIAS SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 697467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN UNSRVD - SUMMONS ON DONALD A TROISI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-25 DTD 050720

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE COURTESY COPIES TO THE PRESIDING JUDGE DTD 081715

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMTN IN LIMINE PROCEDURE ORDER FOR THE CIVIL JURY AND CIVIL NON JURY DOCKET FOR THE HONORABLE DONALD E SCAGLIONE AND THE HONORABLE GEORGE G ANGELIADIS CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION EFFECT 010119 DTD 083018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DONALD A TROISI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 683157

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DONALD A TROISI ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000449CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda R Duffy (esq)