Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 19:34:46 (UTC).

WILLINSKY, KAREN MARY VS WILLINSKY, JOSEPH H

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 WILLINSKY, KAREN MARY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WILLINSKY, JOSEPH H. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLINSKY, KAREN MARY

Respondent

WILLINSKY, JOSEPH H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE TO HCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 4/14/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY FILED BY THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketReopened for Civil Modification on 3/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - DOM VIOLENCE UNTIL 3/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED UNTIL 3/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON JOSEPH H WILLINSKY ON 030121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER - DOM VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS WAIVER/NONWAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/10/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000367DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less