This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 09/02/2021 at 19:41:41 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, CORNELIUS VS GRIFFIN, BRITTNEY

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 WILLIAMS, CORNELIUS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GRIFFIN, BRITTNEY. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, CORNELIUS

Respondent

GRIFFIN, BRITTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH, SCOTT TIMOTHY

Respondent Attorney

BROWN, JAMES MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JAMES BROWN OBO RESPONDENT/MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR:BRITTNEY GRIFFIN SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLERK ON 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 749007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR001474DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JAMES MARTIN