This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/15/2021 at 16:45:03 (UTC).

WILES, LELA VS STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 WILES, LELA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILES, LELA

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

KRAPF, GRANT WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS FORWARDED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY 040621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMIN ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-I DTD 092220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number H 727291

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE assist@krapflegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000213CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT W KRAPF, ESQ