This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/02/2021 at 05:07:47 (UTC).

WEINBERG, FREDRICK L VS HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 WEINBERG, FREDRICK L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEINBERG, FREDRICK L

Defendant

HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VRASPIR, TODD WILLARD

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, JENNIFER PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/05/2021:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/05/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST ~ BLANK

08/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

08/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST 081621

08/19/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST 081621

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER MILLER BROOKS ESQ AND PAUL G TOTTEN ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL ADDRESS jmiller@hamiltonmillerlaw.com

09/28/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER MILLER BROOKS ESQ AND PAUL G TOTTEN ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL ADDRESS jmiller@hamiltonmillerlaw.com

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

10/20/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (PERSONAL INJURY) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

10/20/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (PERSONAL INJURY) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

10/20/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

10/20/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

10/26/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (PERSONAL INJURY) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER MILLER BROOKS ESQ AND PAUL G TOTTEN ESQ AS COUNSEL FOR DEF AND EMAIL ADDRESS jmiller@hamiltonmillerlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST 081621

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $412.00 Receipt Number H 751316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000631CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS , JENNIFER PATRICIA