This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/02/2021 at 19:33:10 (UTC).

WAGUESPACK, SARAH VS GRAHAM, RICHARD JOHN

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 WAGUESPACK, SARAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GRAHAM, RICHARD JOHN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and PAMELA VERGARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

PAMELA VERGARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WAGUESPACK, SARAH

Respondent

GRAHAM, RICHARD JOHN

Not Classified By Court

, RICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BROWN, JAMES MARTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD RICHARD JOHN GRAHAM 13/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 4/14/2021 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketORDER FILED ORDER ON MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FILED TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE JAMES MARTIN BROWN, ESQ. OBO RESPONDENT RICHARD JOHN GRAHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY ORDER FOR PROTECTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPETITIONERS WAIVER/NONWAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST STALKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 3/17/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge PAMELA VERGARA presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000423DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, JAMES MARTIN