This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/25/2019 at 18:16:09 (UTC).

VITOLA, JOHN R VS PACKAN, DAVID LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 VITOLA, JOHN R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PACKAN, DAVID LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPPE, KRISTIE and KRISTIE RUPPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUPPE, KRISTIE

KRISTIE RUPPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VITOLA, JOHN R

Defendant

PACKAN, DAVID LAWRENCE

Not Classified By Court

DAVE,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VITOLA, JOHN R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN PRE TRIAL SET FOR MAY 14, 2019 @9:30 COURTROOM C

04/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN PRE TRIAL SET FOR MAY 14, 2019 @9:30 COURTROOM C

SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN (BLANK)

04/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN (BLANK)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $375.00

04/01/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $375.00

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

04/01/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET -

04/01/2019:SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET -

STATEMENT

04/01/2019:STATEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN PRE TRIAL SET FOR MAY 14, 2019 @9:30 COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 5/14/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Payment received: $90.00 Receipt Number H 619362

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $90.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED DAVID LAWRENCE PACKAN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $375.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 272019SC000821SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Event Date: 05/14/2019 09:30; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C

    Read MoreRead Less