Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:15:36 (UTC).

VITOLA, JOHN R VS ARAZO, FAITH M Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 VITOLA, JOHN R filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ARAZO, FAITH M. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VITOLA, JOHN R

Defendants

ARAZO, JOSE

TENANTS, UNKNOWN

ARAZO, FAITH M

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 021219

02/12/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 021219

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY COUNT I - DTD 020819

02/11/2019:JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY COUNT I - DTD 020819

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO, JOSE ARAZO AND ANY UNKNWN TENANT(S)

02/06/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO, JOSE ARAZO AND ANY UNKNWN TENANT(S)

MOTION FILED FOR CLERK DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I - FILED BY PLNTF

02/04/2019:MOTION FILED FOR CLERK DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I - FILED BY PLNTF

EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOSE ARAZO (INDIVIDUAL) AT 011819

01/30/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOSE ARAZO (INDIVIDUAL) AT 011819

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK AS TO COUNT I - AGAINST DEFS, FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO--JOSE ARAZO--ANY UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

01/29/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK AS TO COUNT I - AGAINST DEFS, FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO--JOSE ARAZO--ANY UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS 012219

01/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS 012219

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON FAIT MICHAELSON ARAZO 012219

01/25/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON FAIT MICHAELSON ARAZO 012219

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

01/16/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO

01/16/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL JOSE ARAZO

01/16/2019:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL JOSE ARAZO

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

01/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE ARAZO (BLANK)

01/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE ARAZO (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO (BLANK)

01/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO (BLANK)

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/15/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/15/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

PETITION FOR EVICTION

01/15/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 021219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY COUNT I - DTD 020819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO, JOSE ARAZO AND ANY UNKNWN TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FILED FOR CLERK DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I - FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: ON JOSE ARAZO (INDIVIDUAL) AT 011819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK AS TO COUNT I - AGAINST DEFS, FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO--JOSE ARAZO--ANY UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS 012219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: POSTED ON FAIT MICHAELSON ARAZO 012219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT(S) (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JOSE ARAZO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FAITH MICHAELSON ARAZO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Case 272019CC000077CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less