This case was last updated from Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/02/2021 at 03:03:22 (UTC).

VIRUET, GAIL VS HUFF, CHINESA Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 VIRUET, GAIL filed an Other lawsuit against HUFF, CHINESA. This case was filed in Hernando County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE and VERGARA, PAMELA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

VERGARA, PAMELA STINNETTE

VERGARA, PAMELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIRUET, GAIL

Defendants

NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC

HUFF, CHINESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA, ALBERT JACK

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/02/2021:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/02/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

07/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED NSS=ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

07/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED NSS=ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

07/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

07/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 090921

08/11/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 090921

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 080921

08/11/2021:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 080921

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

08/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

08/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

MOTION TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFS NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE AND CHINESA HUFF

09/13/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFS NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE AND CHINESA HUFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

09/13/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/21/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/21/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PLNTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFS NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE AND CHINESA HUFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHINESA HUFF 081021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 080921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON NSS-ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) 090921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE ALF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED NSS=ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC DBA NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CHINESA HUFF, ADMINISTRATOR NOBLE SENIOR LIVING AT BROOKSVILLE (ALF) ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number H 744660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CA000538CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NSS ALF BROOKSVILLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRERA , ALBERT JACK