This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/15/2020 at 13:20:32 (UTC).

VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC VS LILES, TALICIA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LILES, TALICIA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC

Defendant

LILES, TALICIA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RTND SRVD - TALICIA LILES 10/6/20 POSTED

10/09/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION RTND SRVD - TALICIA LILES 10/6/20 POSTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

10/05/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 092920

09/29/2020:DEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 092920

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT TALICIA LILES

09/29/2020:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT TALICIA LILES

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TALICIA LILES

09/25/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TALICIA LILES

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC

09/25/2020:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/16/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EVICTION SUMMONS, COMPLAINT 9/16/20 TALICIA LILES

09/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EVICTION SUMMONS, COMPLAINT 9/16/20 TALICIA LILES

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

09/15/2020:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

09/15/2020:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PETITION FOR EVICTION

09/15/2020:PETITION FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TALICIA LILES (PL)

09/15/2020:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TALICIA LILES (PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RTND SRVD - TALICIA LILES 10/6/20 POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 701366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT/JUDGMENT - EVICTION GRANTED - DTD 092920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT TALICIA LILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AGAINST TALICIA LILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY VILLAS OF OAKDALE HERNANDO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL TALICIA LILES (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $202.00 Receipt Number H 698710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $202.00 Balance Remaining $202.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CC000790CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less