This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 11/01/2021 at 16:34:49 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS WEST, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEST, RICHARD. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

WEST, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

DICKERSON, MATTHEW JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

07/01/2021:COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

07/01/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD WEST ~ BLANK

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD WEST ~ BLANK

STATEMENT OF CLAIM 3807.10

07/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM 3807.10

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD WEST - PTC 093021 11:30AM CRTRM B

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD WEST - PTC 093021 11:30AM CRTRM B

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY DEF, RICHARD WEST

08/10/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY DEF, RICHARD WEST

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY -FILED BY DEF

08/10/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY -FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF M. JOSEPH DICKERSON, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEF, DESIG OF EMAIL dickerson@heritagelawyers.com

08/10/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF M. JOSEPH DICKERSON, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEF, DESIG OF EMAIL dickerson@heritagelawyers.com

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF

08/10/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE -FILED BY DEF

08/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE -FILED BY DEF

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS CHANGE rweissman@ollawgroup.com, -FILED BY PLNTF

08/13/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS CHANGE rweissman@ollawgroup.com, -FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/22/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RICHARD WEST 083021

09/23/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RICHARD WEST 083021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON RICHARD WEST 083021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS CHANGE rweissman@ollawgroup.com, -FILED BY PLNTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF M. JOSEPH DICKERSON, ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF DEF, DESIG OF EMAIL dickerson@heritagelawyers.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY -FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -FILED BY DEF, RICHARD WEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RICHARD WEST - PTC 093021 11:30AM CRTRM B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 744700

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM 3807.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHARD WEST ~ BLANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC001718SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M JOSEPH DICKERSON