This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 05/05/2019 at 13:15:33 (UTC).

VELLANTI, CHRISTOPHER VS SKIPPER, JR, MICHAEL A Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 VELLANTI, CHRISTOPHER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SKIPPER, JR, MICHAEL A. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELLANTI, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

WHISNANT, CHARLENE

SKIPPER, JR, MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR / CHARLENE WHISNANT- CLERK DEFAULT

05/06/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR / CHARLENE WHISNANT- CLERK DEFAULT

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR / CHARLENE WHISNANT - ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY

05/06/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR / CHARLENE WHISNANT - ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY

WRIT OF POSSESSION(PL)

04/29/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION(PL)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- EVICTION DTD 042519

04/25/2019:ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- EVICTION DTD 042519

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR. AND COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES - TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR.

05/06/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR. AND COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES - TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR.

UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLENE WHISNANT AND COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES - TO CHARLENE WHISNANT

05/06/2019:UNDELIVERED MAIL RETURNED - EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLENE WHISNANT AND COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION & DAMAGES - TO CHARLENE WHISNANT

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR AND CHARLENE WHISNANT

04/23/2019:DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR AND CHARLENE WHISNANT

MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER VELLANTI

04/23/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER VELLANTI

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR DTD 04122019

04/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR DTD 04122019

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHARLENE WHISNANT DTD 04122019

04/23/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHARLENE WHISNANT DTD 04122019

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/12/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/11/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT CHARLENE WHISNANT

04/11/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT CHARLENE WHISNANT

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR

04/11/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR

PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

04/11/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION, 3 DAY NOTICE

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLENE WHISNANT (PL)

04/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLENE WHISNANT (PL)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR (PL)

04/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR (PL)

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION(PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Payment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 623607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • ENTRY OF DEFAULT/JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY- EVICTION DTD 042519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR AND CHARLENE WHISNANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER VELLANTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHAEL A SKIPPER JR DTD 04122019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CHARLENE WHISNANT DTD 04122019

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLENE WHISNANT (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MICHAEL A SKIPPER, JR (PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number H 620954

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Active Process EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $219.00 Balance Remaining $219.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case 272019CC000512CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less