This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 21:10:39 (UTC).

VANDERBURG, PAUL STACEY

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 VANDERBURG, PAUL STACEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

VANDERBURG, PAUL STACEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE: CONSOLIDATION PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL - DEBORAH R HUMMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL - DAVID A HUMMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $7.00 Receipt Number H 699927

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $7.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF PAUL STACEY VANDERBURG ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CP001034CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less