This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 19:48:43 (UTC).

UNDESTAD, TERRY KENNETH VS MONSTER TRANSMISSION

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 UNDESTAD, TERRY KENNETH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONSTER TRANSMISSION. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUPPE, KRISTIE and KRISTIE RUPPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUPPE, KRISTIE

KRISTIE RUPPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNDESTAD, TERRY KENNETH

Defendant

MONSTER TRANSMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

REY, JENNIFER CRUZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - FILED BY JENNIFER C. REY, ESQ. - ATTY FOR DEFS, MONSTER TRANSMISSION AND ACHILLES, THOMAS, OWNER (PRIMARY EMAIL: jennifer@hoganlawfirm.com)

02/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - FILED BY JENNIFER C. REY, ESQ. - ATTY FOR DEFS, MONSTER TRANSMISSION AND ACHILLES, THOMAS, OWNER (PRIMARY EMAIL: jennifer@hoganlawfirm.com)

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON THOMAS ACHILLES AT DEF USUAL PLACE OF ABODE BY SERVING EVA ACHILLES, SPOUSE 011719

01/30/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON THOMAS ACHILLES AT DEF USUAL PLACE OF ABODE BY SERVING EVA ACHILLES, SPOUSE 011719

SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

01/17/2019:SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/17/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1783.87

01/17/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1783.87

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MONSTER TRANSMISSION ACHILLES, THOMAS OWNER(PL)

01/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MONSTER TRANSMISSION ACHILLES, THOMAS OWNER(PL)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - FILED BY JENNIFER C. REY, ESQ. - ATTY FOR DEFS, MONSTER TRANSMISSION AND ACHILLES, THOMAS, OWNER (PRIMARY EMAIL: jennifer@hoganlawfirm.com)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON THOMAS ACHILLES AT DEF USUAL PLACE OF ABODE BY SERVING EVA ACHILLES, SPOUSE 011719

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $1783.87

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: MONSTER TRANSMISSION ACHILLES, THOMAS OWNER(PL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Payment received: $192.00 Receipt Number H 606037

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $192.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Active Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 3/5/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KRISTIE RUPPE presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $192.00 Balance Remaining $192.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Case 272019SC000158SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Event Date: 03/05/2019 09:30; Judge: RUPPE, KRISTIE; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM C; Defendant Attorney: REY, JENNIFER C

    Read MoreRead Less