This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 16:25:40 (UTC).

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC AAO SAMMIE KE VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 TRUVIEW MOLD LLC AAO SAMMIE KE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL, BARBARA-JO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL, BARBARA-JO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUVIEW MOLD LLC AAO SAMMIE KE

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, DAVID FERNANDO

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

12/02/2022:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION -BLANK-

12/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION -BLANK-

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/02/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

INTERROGATORY

12/02/2022:INTERROGATORY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/02/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - PTC 020123 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

12/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - PTC 020123 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - PTC 020123 AT 9:15 CRTRM C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number H 824700

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 272022SC002570SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRUVEW MOLD, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant