This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 10/21/2020 at 18:21:13 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 TRUIST BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK

Defendants

CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC

SIMMONS, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS, THOMAS LEE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA SIMMONS 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

09/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA SIMMONS 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC - PTC 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

09/25/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC - PTC 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $7,474.85

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $7,474.85

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA SIMMONS - BLANK

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA SIMMONS - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CCSIMONNS ENTERPRISES - BLANK

09/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CCSIMONNS ENTERPRISES - BLANK

COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHRISTINA SIMMONS 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CCSIMMONS ENTERPRISES INC - PTC 110620 @ 9:15AM, CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number H 699643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINA SIMMONS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR CCSIMONNS ENTERPRISES - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM $7,474.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020SC001916SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less