This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 09/22/2020 at 16:23:36 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE VS PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE

Defendants

SULLIVAN, CHARLES

SULLIVAN, JOYCE

PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA

Not Classified By Court

SULLIVAN, CHARLES C

SULLIVAN, JOYCE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINARSKY, AMY JILL

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE FILED BY DFDNT CHARLES SULLIVAN

09/30/2020:RESPONSE FILED BY DFDNT CHARLES SULLIVAN

RESPONSE FILED BY DFDNT CHARLES SULLIVAN

09/30/2020:RESPONSE FILED BY DFDNT CHARLES SULLIVAN

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN 091020

09/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN 091020

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN (SUBST SERVED TO JOYCE A SULLIVAN) 091020

09/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN (SUBST SERVED TO JOYCE A SULLIVAN) 091020

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOYCE SULLIVAN AK AJOYCE A SULLIVAN

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOYCE SULLIVAN AK AJOYCE A SULLIVAN

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA

08/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA

SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

08/31/2020:SUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

08/31/2020:ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-G DTD 080420

08/31/2020:ADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-G DTD 080420

SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN - BLANK

08/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN - BLANK

08/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA - BLANK

08/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA - BLANK

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

08/26/2020:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

08/26/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

COVER SHEET

08/26/2020:COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN 091020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN (SUBST SERVED TO JOYCE A SULLIVAN) 091020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO AOSC20-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMIN ORDER A-2020-12-G DTD 080420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOYCE SULLIVAN AK AJOYCE A SULLIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number H 696237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CHARLES SULLIVAN AKA CHARLES C SULLIVAN - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE SULLIVAN AKA JOYCE A SULLIVAN - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PINNACLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000716CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winarsky, Amy Jill