Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 14:05:04 (UTC).

TRIPLE C INVESMENTS OAK PARK L VS FLOWERS, CAROLYN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 TRIPLE C INVESMENTS OAK PARK L filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against FLOWERS, CAROLYN. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIPLE C INVESMENTS OAK PARK L

Defendant

FLOWERS, CAROLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIORI, CHRISTOPHE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS POSTED ON 04/03/2019

04/10/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS POSTED ON 04/03/2019

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK ON 03272019

03/27/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK ON 03272019

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK - (EP)

03/14/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK - (EP)

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST CAROLYN FLOWERS DTD 022619

02/26/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST CAROLYN FLOWERS DTD 022619

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF

02/26/2019:MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF

RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: ALIAS SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS (POSTED) AT 021219

02/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: ALIAS SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS (POSTED) AT 021219

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - POSSESSION, FILED BY PLNTF

02/26/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - POSSESSION, FILED BY PLNTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COURT DEFAULT) - FILED BY PLNTF

02/26/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COURT DEFAULT) - FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT, CAROLYN FLOWERS

02/12/2019:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT, CAROLYN FLOWERS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

02/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

ALIAS EVICTION SUMMONS - RESIDENTIAL, ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS (BLANK)

02/12/2019:ALIAS EVICTION SUMMONS - RESIDENTIAL, ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS (BLANK)

VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE - RE: EVICTION SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS

02/12/2019:VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE - RE: EVICTION SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO DEFS/TENANTS ON 020619

02/06/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO DEFS/TENANTS ON 020619

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

02/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN FLOWERS - BLANK

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN FLOWERS - BLANK

PETITION FOR EVICTION

01/31/2019:PETITION FOR EVICTION

EXHIBITS - B

01/31/2019:EXHIBITS - B

EXHIBITS - A

01/31/2019:EXHIBITS - A

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - POSSESSION DTD 022619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE AGAINST CAROLYN FLOWERS DTD 022619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - RE: ALIAS SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON CAROLYN FLOWERS (POSTED) AT 021219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - POSSESSION, FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT (COURT DEFAULT) - FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT, CAROLYN FLOWERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS EVICTION SUMMONS - RESIDENTIAL, ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: CAROLYN FLOWERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number H 608833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CAROLYN FLOWERS - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS - A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case 272019CC000176CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHE FIORI