This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 12/20/2019 at 16:17:01 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF THEODORA WAPPMAN Et Al VS AGOSTINO, VALERIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 THE ESTATE OF THEODORA WAPPMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AGOSTINO, VALERIE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE ESTATE OF THEODORA WAPPMAN

WAPPMAN, JOSEPH

Defendants

THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC

FL EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

SWONGER, RONALD L

AGOSTINO, VALERIE

Not Classified By Court

SUMPTER, VALERIE

THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO STAY AND DEMAND FOR ARBITRATION (DEFS THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, RONALD L. SWONGER AND VALERIE AGOSTINO'S)

01/16/2020:MOTION TO STAY AND DEMAND FOR ARBITRATION (DEFS THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES, LLC, RONALD L. SWONGER AND VALERIE AGOSTINO'S)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FL EVERGREEN WOODS

12/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FL EVERGREEN WOODS

SUMMONS ISSUED VALERIE AGOSTINO (BLANK)

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED VALERIE AGOSTINO (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED RONALD L SWONGER (BLANK)

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RONALD L SWONGER (BLANK)

SUMMONS ISSUED FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC (BLANK)

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC (BLANK)

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS HDanes@wilkesmchugh.com

11/26/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS HDanes@wilkesmchugh.com

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO VALERIE AGOSTINO

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO VALERIE AGOSTINO

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS, LLC'S)

01/16/2020:MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS, LLC'S)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO RONALD L SWONGER

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO RONALD L SWONGER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL TO AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

INTERROGATORY TO DEF THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

11/26/2019:INTERROGATORY TO DEF THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

INTERROGATORY TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

11/26/2019:INTERROGATORY TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

INTERROGATORY TO DEF AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

11/26/2019:INTERROGATORY TO DEF AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

11/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: VALERIE AGOSTINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: RONALD SWONGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: AIRMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: FL EVERGREEN WOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $450.00 Receipt Number H 657730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $450.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED VALERIE AGOSTINO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RONALD L SWONGER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY TO DEF AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF FI-EVERGREEN WOODS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FKA AIRAMID HEALTHMANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001344CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant