Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/30/2021 at 19:31:43 (UTC).

TERRITO, LINDA VS TERRITO, FRANK

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 TERRITO, LINDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TERRITO, FRANK. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EINEMAN, THOMAS RALPH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TERRITO, LINDA

Respondent

TERRITO, FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDG SIMP DISS MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER W/O CHILDREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number H 729030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - LINDA TERRITO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - FRANK P TERRITO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB - LINDA TERRITO

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPETITION FILED FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000618DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less