This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 17:14:05 (UTC).

TASCARELLA, MICHAEL VS ALMEIDA, ANGELINA

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 TASCARELLA, MICHAEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ALMEIDA, ANGELINA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBEE, DON JR and DON BARBEE JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARBEE, DON JR

DON BARBEE JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TASCARELLA, MICHAEL

Respondent

ALMEIDA, ANGELINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING - INJUNCTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDV ORDER - RETURNED SERVED ON ANGELINA ALMEIDA ON 4/22/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 4/30/2020 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING ZOOM HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR000700DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less