This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:26:05 (UTC).

SZEGDA, DAWN VS ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SZEGDA, DAWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT, KURT HITZEMANN and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

KURT HITZEMANN

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SZEGDA, DAWN

Defendant

ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PLNTF, IN THE SUM OF $1,260.00--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PLNTF DO HAVE AND RECOVER OF AND FROM DEF, THE SUM OF N/A DAMAGES, TOGETHER WITH THE COSTS AND INTEREST IN THIS BEHALF EXPENDED AND HEREIN TAXED AT N/A--THIS JUDGMENT SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT STATUTORY RATE OF 6.83% PER ANNUM, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE - DTD 022020

02/20/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PLNTF, IN THE SUM OF $1,260.00--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PLNTF DO HAVE AND RECOVER OF AND FROM DEF, THE SUM OF N/A DAMAGES, TOGETHER WITH THE COSTS AND INTEREST IN THIS BEHALF EXPENDED AND HEREIN TAXED AT N/A--THIS JUDGMENT SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT STATUTORY RATE OF 6.83% PER ANNUM, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE - DTD 022020

COURT WORKSHEET - FINAL HEARING: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN COURT--JUDGMENT ASSESSED IN AMOUNT OF $1,260.00--JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARED BY CLERK--FACT INFO SHEET REQ'D IN 45 DAYS

02/20/2020:COURT WORKSHEET - FINAL HEARING: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN COURT--JUDGMENT ASSESSED IN AMOUNT OF $1,260.00--JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARED BY CLERK--FACT INFO SHEET REQ'D IN 45 DAYS

NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING - ON 022020 AT 3:30PM, IN CRTROOM B

01/15/2020:NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING - ON 022020 AT 3:30PM, IN CRTROOM B

MEDIATION REPORT NO AGREEMENT

01/14/2020:MEDIATION REPORT NO AGREEMENT

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS- THIS CASE WAS NOT SETLED. THE PARTIES HAVE NOTIFIED THE COURT AND THIS CAUSE IS BEING SET FOR TRIAL

01/14/2020:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS- THIS CASE WAS NOT SETLED. THE PARTIES HAVE NOTIFIED THE COURT AND THIS CAUSE IS BEING SET FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 02/20/20/ AT 3PM IN CTRM B

01/14/2020:NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 02/20/20/ AT 3PM IN CTRM B

COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUED TO 02/20/20 AT 3

01/14/2020:COURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUED TO 02/20/20 AT 3

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: TOM WOZNIAK 121619

12/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED: TOM WOZNIAK 121619

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC, TOM WOZNIAK (PL) PRTRL 01/14/2020 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC, TOM WOZNIAK (PL) PRTRL 01/14/2020 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

12/06/2019:APPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

12/06/2019:SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - DEF IS INDEBTED TO PLNTF, IN THE SUM OF $1,260.00--IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT PLNTF DO HAVE AND RECOVER OF AND FROM DEF, THE SUM OF N/A DAMAGES, TOGETHER WITH THE COSTS AND INTEREST IN THIS BEHALF EXPENDED AND HEREIN TAXED AT N/A--THIS JUDGMENT SHALL BEAR INTEREST AT STATUTORY RATE OF 6.83% PER ANNUM, FOR ALL OF WHICH LET EXECUTION ISSUE - DTD 022020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - FINAL HEARING: FINAL JUDGMENT SIGNED IN COURT--JUDGMENT ASSESSED IN AMOUNT OF $1,260.00--JUDGMENT WILL BE PREPARED BY CLERK--FACT INFO SHEET REQ'D IN 45 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEvent SC scheduled on 2/20/2020 at 3:30 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING - ON 022020 AT 3:30PM, IN CRTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/14/2020 09:00; Judge: HITZEMANN, KURT; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: HERNANDO COUNTY COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS- THIS CASE WAS NOT SETLED. THE PARTIES HAVE NOTIFIED THE COURT AND THIS CAUSE IS BEING SET FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING ON 02/20/20/ AT 3PM IN CTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - CONTINUED TO 02/20/20 AT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: ELEGANT HOLDINGS LLC, TOM WOZNIAK (PL) PRTRL 01/14/2020 @ 9:00AM, CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CIVIL INDIGENCY - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketActive Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketEvent AMPT scheduled on 1/14/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019SC002794SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less