Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/24/2021 at 18:18:23 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS VILLAFANA, JUDY C

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VILLAFANA, JUDY C. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEALIS, KRISTIE MARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

VILLAFANA, JUDY C

Spring Hill, FL 34609-5451

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

03/01/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $2788.42

03/01/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $2788.42

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JUDY VILLAFANA (BLANK)

03/01/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JUDY VILLAFANA (BLANK)

COVER SHEET

03/01/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON JULIA VILLAFANA @031321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JUDY VILLAFANA - PTC 051221 9:15AM CRTRM C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 723660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS TO JUDY VILLAFANA (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $2788.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021SC000493SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J