This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/04/2019 at 18:16:00 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS CARTER, TYRONE

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARTER, TYRONE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HITZEMANN, KURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HITZEMANN, KURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

CARTER, TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON TYRONE CARTER

03/29/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON TYRONE CARTER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE CARTER - PTC 052219 AT 9:15 CRTRM B

03/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE CARTER - PTC 052219 AT 9:15 CRTRM B

SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE CARTER (BLANK)

03/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE CARTER (BLANK)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

03/11/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,869.23

03/11/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,869.23

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD NOT SERVED ON TYRONE CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: TYRONE CARTER - PTC 052219 AT 9:15 CRTRM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 615945

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE CARTER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $3,869.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Case 272019SC000641SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less