This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 07:21:40 (UTC).

SYKES, LEON E

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SYKES, LEON E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

SYKES, LEON E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $5.00 Receipt Number H 672785

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT ADDITIONAL PARTY SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT SUSAN JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $21.00 Receipt Number H 659439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $21.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $21.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT LEON E. SYKES ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT/PRODUCTION OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CP001329CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less