This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/25/2020 at 16:56:36 (UTC).

SWEENY, KENNETH VS DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 SWEENY, KENNETH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWEENY, KENNETH

Defendants

DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

LIVRIERI, PAUL F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LAZARO, PAUL LOUIS

RINE, JOHN AUSTIN

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIP FOR DISMISS W/PREJ

10/19/2020:JOINT STIP FOR DISMISS W/PREJ

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFENDANT DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC

02/13/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFENDANT DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC RE MEDICARE/MEDICAID FILED BY PLNTF

01/24/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC RE MEDICARE/MEDICAID FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI FILED BY PLNTF

01/24/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

01/15/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

01/15/2020:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (UNVERIFIED) FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANT

01/15/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANT

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION KENNETH SWEENY ON 030220 AT 10:30 FILED BY DEFS

01/15/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION KENNETH SWEENY ON 030220 AT 10:30 FILED BY DEFS

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

12/20/2019:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (MEDICARE/MEDICAID) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

12/09/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (MEDICARE/MEDICAID) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

12/09/2019:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESAURANTS INC

12/09/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, DARDEN RESAURANTS INC

SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC 110719

12/03/2019:SERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC 110719

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS (JOHN A. RINE, PRIMARY EMAIL: john.rine@lewisbrisbois.com) AND (NICHOLAS P. DARENEAU, PRIMARY EMAIL: nicholas.dareneau@lewisbrisbois.com)

11/26/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS (JOHN A. RINE, PRIMARY EMAIL: john.rine@lewisbrisbois.com) AND (NICHOLAS P. DARENEAU, PRIMARY EMAIL: nicholas.dareneau@lewisbrisbois.com)

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL LIVRIERIA

10/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL LIVRIERIA

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC

10/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/18/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COVER SHEET

10/18/2019:COVER SHEET

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED OF DISMISSAL W/ PREJ DTD 110220

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIP FOR DISMISS W/PREJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF KENNETH SWEENY SCHED FOR 030220 FILED BY DEFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFENDANT DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MEDICARE/MEDICAID REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC RE MEDICARE/MEDICAID FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, PAUL LIVRIERI FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES OF DEF, DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PAUL LIVRIERI ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DARDEN RESTAURANTS, INC. ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PPLPLeadings@forthepeople.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001178CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DARDEN RESTAURANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZARO , PAUL LOUIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rine, John Austin