Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 13:15:32 (UTC).

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION VS HUBBELL, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against HUBBELL, THOMAS. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPPE, KRISTIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUPPE, KRISTIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Defendant

HUBBELL, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUFFY, AMANDA ROATH

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON THOMAS HUBBELL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032919

04/02/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON THOMAS HUBBELL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032919

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THOMAS HUBBELL

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THOMAS HUBBELL

COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

03/14/2019:COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

COVER SHEET

03/14/2019:COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS HUBBELL (BLANK)

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS HUBBELL (BLANK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETD SERVED ON THOMAS HUBBELL (INDIVIDUALLY/PERSONALLY) AT 032919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: THOMAS HUBBELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number H 616995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED THOMAS HUBBELL (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 272019CC000390CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less