This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 18:31:45 (UTC).

STURM, NENA MAREE VS COLE-EASTMAN, TYLER FORREST

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 STURM, NENA MAREE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against COLE-EASTMAN, TYLER FORREST. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STURM, NENA MAREE

Respondent

COLE-EASTMAN, TYLER FORREST

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - PET VOL WITHDREW MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION AS TO TIME SHARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketReopen Civil Modification closed on 7/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING FINAL HEARING ON REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION 7/8/20 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET - CASE CONT UNTIL 7/8/2020 @ 1:30 FOR 1 HOUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 7/8/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 6/24/2020 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 6/24/2020 AT 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY FILED BY THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 6/3/2020 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge DON BARBEE JR presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING - 6/3/20 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITIONERS WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJ DOM VIOLENCE WITH CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase 272020DR000875DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less