Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/06/2019 at 19:41:00 (UTC).

STUDLEY, TERESA VS J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 STUDLEY, TERESA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and KURT HITZEMANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

KURT HITZEMANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDLEY, TERESA

Defendant

J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

02/05/2019:MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 040219 @ 1:30 PM CRTM B

02/05/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING ON 040219 @ 1:30 PM CRTM B

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS - NO AGREEMENT

02/05/2019:SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS - NO AGREEMENT

COURT WORKSHEET - SET FOR FINAL HEARING

02/05/2019:COURT WORKSHEET - SET FOR FINAL HEARING

SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE 011619

01/11/2019:SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE 011619

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER; J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE

01/10/2019:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER; J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM TO J&M PROPERTY MAINTENANCE P/T 020519 @ 9:30 AM (CERT MAIL)

01/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM TO J&M PROPERTY MAINTENANCE P/T 020519 @ 9:30 AM (CERT MAIL)

DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

01/07/2019:DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

01/07/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM $5,000.00

01/07/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM $5,000.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEDIATION REPORT - NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 040219 @ 1:30 PM CRTM B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RESULTS - NO AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT WORKSHEET - SET FOR FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE - CERT MAIL RET SERVED TO JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE 011619

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-JOHN MILAZZO, OWNER; J&A PROPERTY MAINTENANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/STATE OF CLAM TO J&M PROPERTY MAINTENANCE P/T 020519 @ 9:30 AM (CERT MAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCUMENTS FILED - SMALL CLAIMS WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Payment received: $324.00 Receipt Number H 604369

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $324.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $324.00 Balance Remaining $324.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Active Process NOTICE OF PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Event AMPT scheduled on 2/5/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KURT HITZEMANN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $317.00 Balance Remaining $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case 272019SC000056SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Event Date: 02/05/2019 09:30; Judge: HITZEMANN, KURT; Docket Type: AMPT; Location: MX COURTROOM B

    Read MoreRead Less