Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 19:44:34 (UTC).

STREET, THEODIS VS STREET, VERONICA

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 STREET, THEODIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STREET, VERONICA. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBEE, DON JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARBEE, DON JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STREET, THEODIS

Respondent

STREET, VERONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARLOWE, RUSSELL GEORGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SERVED ON 03/04/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMIL LAW COURT ORDER W/CHILDREN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: VERONICA STREET SIGNED AND SEALED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE - THEODIS FLEMMING STREET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING HUSBAND'S DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number H 723174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 272021DR000383DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARLOWE, RUSSELL GEORGE