This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 11/01/2021 at 13:07:29 (UTC).

STAVROPOULOS, ANDREAS G VS CLC HAULING INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 STAVROPOULOS, ANDREAS G filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLC HAULING INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE and SCAGLIONE, DONALD E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCAGLIONE, DONALD EUGENE

SCAGLIONE, DONALD E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STAVROPOULOS, ANDREAS G

Defendants

CLC HAULING INC

HUNTER, BENJAMIN E

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACYSZYN, MARTIN

Defendant Attorneys

AIELLO, JULIE ANN

LONIGRO, DAVID JOHN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -FILED BY PL

10/19/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -FILED BY PL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CO-DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC

09/10/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CO-DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO CO-DEF CLC HAULING INC FILED BY DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

08/11/2021:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO CO-DEF CLC HAULING INC FILED BY DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

OBJECTION TO NTC OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DIRECTED TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

08/05/2021:OBJECTION TO NTC OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DIRECTED TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER C.L.C. HAULING INC (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

08/05/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER C.L.C. HAULING INC (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -DTD 080421

08/04/2021:ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -DTD 080421

ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF C.L.C. HAULING, INC. -DTD 080421

08/04/2021:ORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF C.L.C. HAULING, INC. -DTD 080421

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE RC: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF

07/27/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE RC: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC FILED BY PLNTF

06/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER FILED BY PLNTF

06/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER FILED BY PLNTF

06/16/2021:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD OF DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER FILED BY PLNTF

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

06/16/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 111121 AT 1:30 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEPHEN G BRANNAN ESQ FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

05/05/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION ON 111121 AT 1:30 VIA ZOOM W/ MEDIATOR STEPHEN G BRANNAN ESQ FILED BY DEF, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN AND RESPONSE TO BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -FILED BY PLNTF

04/29/2021:AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN AND RESPONSE TO BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -FILED BY PLNTF

AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN AND RESPONSE TO C.L.C. HAULING, INC. -FILED BY PLNTF

04/29/2021:AVOIDANCE OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFEN AND RESPONSE TO C.L.C. HAULING, INC. -FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, BENJAMIN E HUNTER

04/22/2021:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF, BENJAMIN E HUNTER

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY C.L.C. HAULING INC

04/13/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY C.L.C. HAULING INC

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY BENJAMIN E HUNTER

04/13/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY BENJAMIN E HUNTER

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CO-DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO CO-DEF CLC HAULING INC FILED BY DEF PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NTC OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY DIRECTED TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER C.L.C. HAULING INC (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF, BENJAMIN E. HUNTER -DTD 080421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FILED - AGREED ORDER TO SET ASIDE THE CLK'S DEFAULT AGAINST DEF C.L.C. HAULING, INC. -DTD 080421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY RE RC: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF C.L.C. HAULING INC FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEF BENJAMIN E HUNTER FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, C L C HAULING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORY - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT BENJAMIN E HUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CHARLES F GRANT, JR ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO BENJAMIN E HUNTER ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ~ BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000447CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN MACYSZYN