Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 03/27/2021 at 13:18:42 (UTC).

SPRING RIDGE OF HERNANDO HOMEO VS 1, UNKNOWN TENANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 SPRING RIDGE OF HERNANDO HOMEO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 1, UNKNOWN TENANT. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Hernando County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPRING RIDGE OF HERNANDO HOMEO

Defendants

TWITTY, JOSHUA

2, UNKNOWN TENANT

1, UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAWAD, SARA S.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

03/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

03/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSHUA TWITTY

03/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSHUA TWITTY

COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

03/01/2021:COMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - BLANK

03/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - BLANK

03/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - BLANK

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA TWITTY - BLANK

03/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA TWITTY - BLANK

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/01/2021:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS sjawad@shumaker.com

03/01/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS sjawad@shumaker.com

COVER SHEET

03/01/2021:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $439.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $439.00 Receipt Number H 724976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $439.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $439.00 Balance Remaining $439.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: JOSHUA TWITTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA TWITTY - BLANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-FORECLOSURE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS sjawad@shumaker.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CC000264CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPRING RIDGE OF HERNANDO HOMEO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAWAD , SARA S.