This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 07/14/2021 at 21:21:40 (UTC).

SPAKOWSKI, MARGARET D

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 SPAKOWSKI, MARGARET D was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

SPAKOWSKI, MARGARET D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent Attorney

JONAS, STEVEN KEITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $41.00 Receipt Number H 741808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $41.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST MARGARET SPAKOWSKI TRUST DATED OCTOBER 5, 1998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase 272021CP000802CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONAS, STEVEN KEITH