This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 16:45:44 (UTC).

SOUTHERN VALLEY HOMES VS HORSMAN, PAUL

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 SOUTHERN VALLEY HOMES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HORSMAN, PAUL. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN VALLEY HOMES

Defendant

HORSMAN, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOGEWIND, JACK DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVING OF LIS PENDENS

05/07/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVING OF LIS PENDENS

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEF

04/08/2020:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN

04/01/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN (BLANK)

03/31/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN (BLANK)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

03/30/2020:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

03/25/2020:COMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

COVER SHEET

03/25/2020:COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVING OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number H 677113

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: PAUL HORSMAN (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $5.00 Receipt Number H 676905

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $5.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number H 676618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR CONTRACT/INDEBT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCase 272020CA000314CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOOGEWIND, JACK DOUGLAS