This case was last updated from Hernando County Courts on 09/10/2022 at 13:22:47 (UTC).

SMITH, LISA S VS All Other Unknown Persons in P Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 SMITH, LISA S filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against All Other Unknown Persons in P. This case was filed in Hernando County Courts, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HITZEMANN, KURT and HITZEMANN, KURT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HITZEMANN, KURT

HITZEMANN, KURT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, LISA S

Defendants

SMITH, MIKAELA

All Other Unknown Persons in P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

08/12/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/12/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED MIKAELA SMITH -BLANK-

08/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED MIKAELA SMITH -BLANK-

SUMMONS ISSUED ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION -BLANK-

08/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION -BLANK-

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: MIKAELA SMITH

08/12/2022:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: MIKAELA SMITH

SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

08/12/2022:SUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO: MIKAELA SMITH 081922

08/22/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO: MIKAELA SMITH 081922

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

08/22/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

ANSWER FROM DEF WITH STATEMENTS FROM OTHER PARTIES.

08/26/2022:ANSWER FROM DEF WITH STATEMENTS FROM OTHER PARTIES.

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL EVICTION ON 091422 AT 2:45PM CRTRM C PARTIES MAY APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

08/30/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL EVICTION ON 091422 AT 2:45PM CRTRM C PARTIES MAY APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

MOTION FILED - MOTION TO DISMISS - FILED BY MIKAELA SMITH

09/08/2022:MOTION FILED - MOTION TO DISMISS - FILED BY MIKAELA SMITH

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FILED - MOTION TO DISMISS - FILED BY MIKAELA SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,390.00 Receipt Number H 811672

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $1,390.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $1,390.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $1,405.35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL EVICTION ON 091422 AT 2:45PM CRTRM C PARTIES MAY APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FROM DEF WITH STATEMENTS FROM OTHER PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ON ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO: MIKAELA SMITH 081922

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS-EVICTION RESIDENTIAL FOR: MIKAELA SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MIKAELA SMITH -BLANK-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number H 807418

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCase 272022CC000903CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less