This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 03/07/2019 at 05:43:47 (UTC).

SMITH, DWAINE VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 SMITH, DWAINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, DWAINE

Defendants

SHORTER, HERBERT BRUCE

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLEMAWESCH, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

LEE, KIMBERLY J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL FILED BY DEF

02/28/2019:NOTICE FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL FILED BY DEF

MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEF

02/28/2019:MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DWAINE SMITH ON 011719 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

01/16/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DWAINE SMITH ON 011719 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND EMAIL pleadings@theFLlawfirm.com

11/15/2018:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND EMAIL pleadings@theFLlawfirm.com

AMENDED NOTICE OF: OF TAKING DEPO ON 011719 @10:00 - DEPONENT DWAINE SMITH

11/06/2018:AMENDED NOTICE OF: OF TAKING DEPO ON 011719 @10:00 - DEPONENT DWAINE SMITH

RESPONSE TO DEFS NTC OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAM AND REQUEST FOR STIP TO CONDITIONS OF EXAM FILED BY PLNTF

10/01/2018:RESPONSE TO DEFS NTC OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAM AND REQUEST FOR STIP TO CONDITIONS OF EXAM FILED BY PLNTF

REQUEST FOR COPIES BY THE DEFENDANT HERBERT SHORTER

08/21/2018:REQUEST FOR COPIES BY THE DEFENDANT HERBERT SHORTER

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

08/17/2018:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DWAINE SMITH ON 082818 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEFS

07/10/2018:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DWAINE SMITH ON 082818 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEFS

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VEFRIFIED) FILED BY DEFS

04/24/2018:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (VEFRIFIED) FILED BY DEFS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER

04/18/2018:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD FILED BY DEF, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFS, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY)

03/15/2018:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFS, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY)

REPLY or ANSWER BRIEF TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER FILED BY PLNTF

03/08/2018:REPLY or ANSWER BRIEF TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEF, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER FILED BY PLNTF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS (DEFS, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER)

03/06/2018:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISS (DEFS, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER)

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER 022618

02/27/2018:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER 022618

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

01/30/2018:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

01/30/2018:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

01/30/2018:COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL ON LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF VOL DISMISSAL AS TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO dismissed 2/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEF, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF COMPULSORY ORTHOPEDIC MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF DWAINE SMITH WITH DR ASHVIN PATEL ON 030819 AT 10:30 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DWAINE SMITH ON 011719 AT 10:00 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF - EXAMINATION OF DWAINE SMITH WITH DR ASHVIN PATEL ON 030819 AT 10:30 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • ADM ORD-REASSIGN JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Judge: ANGELIADIS , GEORGE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC TO DEFENDANT HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HERBERT BRUCE SHORTER (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INS CO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Case 272018CA000098CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, FRANCIS ANTHONY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE , KIMBERLY J