This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County on 08/08/2020 at 12:02:40 (UTC).

SKAHILL, TAMERA VS GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SKAHILL, TAMERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County, Hernando County Courthouse located in Hernando, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Hernando County

  • Courthouse:

    Hernando County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hernando, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SKAHILL, TAMERA

Defendant

GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLIDAY, JAMES WAYNE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PL

05/04/2020:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NO 22

04/20/2020:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NO 22

RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

04/13/2020:RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE OF - WITHDRAWAL W/O PREJ OF DEFS MTN TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO INTERROGS, OVERRULE OBJECTIONS IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND COMPEL ADDITIONAL DOC PRODUCTION FILED 031920 FILED BY DEF

04/01/2020:NOTICE OF - WITHDRAWAL W/O PREJ OF DEFS MTN TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO INTERROGS, OVERRULE OBJECTIONS IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND COMPEL ADDITIONAL DOC PRODUCTION FILED 031920 FILED BY DEF

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

03/03/2020:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS FOR NON-PARTY RECORDS

02/13/2020:OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS FOR NON-PARTY RECORDS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

02/12/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/10/2020:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

02/07/2020:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/03/2020:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

01/03/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEF FILED BY PLNTF

NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF

01/03/2020:NOTICE - SERV OF INTERROGATORY (FIRST SET) TO DEF

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

12/27/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

12/27/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (FIRST) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

SUMMONS ISSUED GULD BREEZE EQUITY CO. C/O DAVID MASTRINO (BLANK)

12/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GULD BREEZE EQUITY CO. C/O DAVID MASTRINO (BLANK)

PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

12/05/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

COVER SHEET

12/05/2019:COVER SHEET

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NTC OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION (SEE DOCUMENT) FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION-NON PARTY - JONELEEN LLC DBA OAK HILL PHARMACY; APEXX PHARMACY LLC; RC: HERNANDO COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NO 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MICHELE MASTRINO ON AUGUST 12, 2020 @10:00AM AT COPPERSTONE EXECUTIVE SUITES LAND O'LAKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF - WITHDRAWAL W/O PREJ OF DEFS MTN TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO INTERROGS, OVERRULE OBJECTIONS IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND COMPEL ADDITIONAL DOC PRODUCTION FILED 031920 FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS MTN TO COMPEL FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE ANSWERS TO INTERROGS, OVERRULE OBJECTIONS IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PROD, COMPEL AMENDED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PROD AND COMPEL ADDITIONAL DOC PROD FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC (SECOND) TO PLNTF FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE OF PROCESS-RTRN SRVD - SUMMONS ON GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO 121819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FOR: GULF BREEZE EQUITY CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $412.00 Receipt Number H 659048

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $412.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED GULD BREEZE EQUITY CO. C/O DAVID MASTRINO (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $412.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 272019CA001375CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLIDAY, JAMES WAYNE